Go To Section
Dartmouth
Borough
Published in The History of Parliament: the House of Commons 1715-1754, ed. R. Sedgwick, 1970
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Background Information
Right of Election:
in the freemen
Number of voters:
33 in 1722; 38 in 17541
Elections
Date | Candidate |
---|---|
4 Feb. 1715 | JOSEPH HERNE |
JOHN FOWNES | |
Nathaniel Herne | |
John Upton | |
24 Mar. 1722 | GEORGE TREBY |
THOMAS MARTYN | |
1 June 1726 | MARTYN re-elected after appointment to office |
21 Aug. 1727 | GEORGE TREBY |
WALTER CAREY | |
29 May 1729 | CAREY re-elected after appointment to office |
21 May 1730 | TREBY re-elected after appointment to office |
27 Apr. 1734 | GEORGE TREBY |
WALTER CAREY | |
25 May 1738 | CAREY re-elected after appointment to office |
27 Nov. 1740 | TREBY re-elected after appointment to office |
6 May 1741 | GEORGE TREBY |
WALTER CAREY | |
27 Mar. 1742 | LORD ARCHIBALD HAMILTON vice Treby, deceased |
2 July 1747 | WALTER CAREY |
JOHN JEFFREYS |
Main Article
Dartmouth passed under government control owing to dissensions between the leading local Tory families, three of whom contested the borough in 1715.2 In 1716 Arthur Holdsworth, a leading Newfoundland merchant, was first elected mayor; by 1719, when he completed his second term of office, the Holdsworths and allied Whig families had a majority on the corporation; and from 1722 until 1754 the borough was managed locally for the Government by the Holdsworths under the direction successively of Lord Chancellor King, George Treby and Walter Carey. Ministerial supporters were invariably returned without opposition.