Go To Section
Ripon
Borough
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Background Information
Right of Election:
in burgage holders
Number of voters:
about 180
Elections
Date | Candidate | Votes |
---|---|---|
4 Feb. 1715 | JOHN AISLABIE | 132 |
CHRISTOPHER WANDESFORD, Visct. Castlecomer | 108 | |
John Sharpe | 64 | |
4 Apr. 1718 | AISLABIE re-elected after appointment to office | |
5 Dec. 1719 | WILLIAM AISLABIE, vice Castlecomer, deceased | |
1 Apr. 1721 | WILLIAM AISLABIE vice John Aislabie, expelled the House | |
28 Mar. 1722 | WILLIAM AISLABIE | |
JOHN SCROPE | ||
16 Aug. 1727 | WILLIAM AISLABIE | |
WILLIAM AISLABIE | ||
29 Apr. 1734 | WILLIAM AISLABIE | |
THOMAS DUNCOMBE | ||
1 Feb. 1738 | AISLABIE re-elected after appointment to office | |
8 May 1741 | WILLIAM AISLABIE | |
HENRY VANE | ||
28 July 1742 | VANE re-elected after appointment to office | |
1 July 1747 | SIR CHARLES VERNON | |
WILLIAM AISLABIE |
Main Article
At George I’s accession the sitting Members for Ripon were John Aislabie of Studley Royal, Whig, and his relation by marriage, John Sharpe, son of the Archbishop of York, a Tory, who had shared the representation without opposition since 1705. In 1715 Aislabie owned about 40 burgages, having spent over £5000 on purchases, while Sharpe owned 11 out of some 180. At the general election that year Sharpe was defeated by Lord Castlecomer, a neighbouring Whig landowner, supported by Aislabie, who headed the poll. By 1720 Aislabie, whose brother had succeeded to the second seat on Castlecomer’s death in 1719, had purchased 36½ more burgages, including all Sharpe’s, thenceforth nominating both Members. By 1744 he owned 91 out of a total of 177 burgages, giving him absolute control of the borough.1
Author: Romney R. Sedgwick
Notes
- 1. Vyner mss in Leeds Public Library, ex inf. J. A. Woods.