Go To Section
BULKELEY, Richard, 4th Visct. Bulkeley [I] (1682-1724), of Baron Hill, Anglesey.
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Family and Education
b. 19 Sept. 1682, o.s. of Richard Bulkeley, M.P., 3rd Visct. Bulkeley [I], by his 1st w. Mary, da. of Sir Philip Egerton of Oulton, Cheshire. educ. Christ’s, Camb. 1698. m. 13 Feb. 1703, Lady Bridget Bertie, da. of James, 1st Earl of Abingdon, 2s. 2da. suc. fa. 19 Aug. 1704.
Offices Held
Chamberlain of N. Wales and constable of Beaumaris castle June 1702-16, of Caernarvon castle Sept. 1713-Nov. 1714; custos rot. Anglesey 1706-Dec. 1715; v.-adm. of N. Wales 1708-10, 1711-15.
Biography
Lord Bulkeley, a member of the October Club, was the head of the Anglesey Tories, and controlled the borough of Beaumaris. An open Jacobite, he retired from Parliament at George I’s accession till 1722 when, ‘at the request of the gentlemen of this county ... though contrary to my inclinations’, he consented to stand again. Returned after a bitter contest,1 he assisted his ally, Watkin Williams Wynn, in Denbighshire, where he is said to have taken part in burning the King’s picture.2
He died 4 June 1724.