Go To Section
Bere Alston
Borough
Published in The History of Parliament: the House of Commons 1790-1820, ed. R. Thorne, 1986
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Available from Boydell and Brewer
Background Information
Right of Election:
in burgage holders
Number of voters:
indefinite and low
Population:
[of parish of Bere Ferrers] (1801): 1,110
Elections
Date | Candidate |
---|---|
18 June 1790 | SIR GEORGE HOWLAND BEAUMONT, Bt. |
JOHN MITFORD | |
20 Feb. 1793 | (SIR) JOHN MITFORD re-elected after appointment to office |
27 May 1796 | (SIR) JOHN MITFORD |
WILLIAM MITFORD | |
29 July 1789 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine, vice (Sir) John Mitford, vacated his seat |
10 July 1802 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine |
WILLIAM MITFORD | |
22 May 1804 | LOVAINE re-elected after appointment to office |
4 Nov. 1806 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine |
HON. JOSCELINE PERCY | |
4 Apr. 1807 | LOVAINE re-elected after appointment to office |
9 May 1807 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine |
HON. JOSCELINE PERCY | |
10 Oct. 1812 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine |
HON. JOSCELINE PERCY | |
20 June 1818 | GEORGE PERCY, Lord Lovaine |
HON. JOSCELINE PERCY |
Main Article
Bere Alston, a village of about 40 houses, was completely under the control of Algernon Percy, 1st Earl of Beverley, the second son of the 1st Duke of Northumberland, on whose death in 1786 he had inherited the lordship of the manor. Beaumont was probably a paying guest. Beverley successively replaced the Mitford brothers, his second cousins, with his first and fourth sons, bringing in the former as soon as he came of age in 1799, and the latter, aged 22, in 1806.